No. 21-1486
Title:Nancy Catherine Powers, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:May 25, 2022
Linked with 21A593
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(1200764)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 07 2022Application (21A593) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 21, 2022 to May 23, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Apr 12 2022Application (21A593) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 23, 2022.
May 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2022Waiver of right of respondent State of Alabama to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 13 2022Response Requested. (Due July 13, 2022)
Jun 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2022 to August 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Theodore Martens
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

matthew.martens@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Nancy Catherine Powers
Attorneys for Respondent
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama