No. 21-1484
Vide 22-51
Title:Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
Navajo Nation, et al.
Docketed:May 25, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17088)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Waiver of right of respondent Navajo Nation to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Waiver of right of respondent Arizona Power Authority to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 24, 2022 to July 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2022.
Jul 15 2022Memorandum of respondents Department of the Interior, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2022Motion of the Navajo Nation seeking an extension of time to file a response from July 25, 2022 to September 23, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022The motion of the Navajo Nation is granted and the time to file a response is extended to and including September 23, 2022.
Sep 23 2022Brief of respondents Navajo Nation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 07 2022Reply of petitioners Arizona, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 04 2022Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-51 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Nov 04 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-1484. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-1484. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Rita Pearson Maguire
    Counsel of Record
Rita P. Maguire, Attorney at Law, PLLC
4139 N. 49th Place
Phoenix, AZ 85018

rmaguire@azwaterlaw.com
602-277-2197
Party name: State of Arizona, State of Nevada, State of Colorado, The Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Navajo Nation
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Interior, et al.
Dena R. BenjaminOffice of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Pnoenix, AZ 85004

dena.benjamin@azag.gov
602-542-7717
Party name: Arizona Power Authority
Alice Elizabeth WalkerMeyer, Walker & Walker, P.C.
1007 Pearl Street Suite 220
Suite 220
Boulder, CO 80302

awalker@mmwclaw.com
3034422021
Party name: Navajo Nation