No. 21-147
Title:Erik Egbert, Petitioner
v.
Robert Boule
Docketed:August 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35789)
   Decision Date:May 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2021 to October 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2021.
Aug 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Border Patrol Council filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent Robert Boule.
Oct 04 2021Brief of respondent Robert Boule in opposition filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Reply of petitioner Erik Egbert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 05 2021Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Nov 05 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Erik Egbert
Attorneys for Respondent
Felicia H. Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

felicia.ellsworth@wilmerhale.com
617-526-6687
Party name: Robert Boule
Other
Jim Ernest Calle
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jim E. Calle
2185 W Magee Road
Suite 125
Tucson, AZ 85742

jimcalle@mac.com
5202750199
Party name: National Border Patrol Council
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 2062
Arlington, VA 22202

john@johnmasslon.com
(703) 791-9483
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center