No. 21-1466
Title:Lenard Johnson, Petitioner
v.
Richard Winfrey, Jr., et al.
Docketed:May 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20477)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 17, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William S. Helfand
    Counsel of Record
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith
24 Greenway Plaza
Suite 1400
Houston, TX 77046

bill.helfand@lewisbrisbois.com
832-460-4614
Party name: Lenard Johnson