No. 21-1463
Title:Missouri, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:May 19, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3725)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2022Brief of respondents Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Amicus brief of Center for Medical Freedom, et al. not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (June 24, 2022)
Jun 21 2022Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Missouri, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Biden, President of U.S., et al.
Other
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, et al.