No. 21-1455
Title:Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, dba Springdale Health and Rehabilitation Center, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:May 17, 2022
Linked with 21A453
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1799)
   Decision Date:October 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 14, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2021Application (21A453) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 14, 2022 to April 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Application (21A453) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 13, 2022.
Mar 25 2022Application (21A453) to extend further the time from April 13, 2022 to May 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Application (21A453) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until May 13, 2022.
May 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2022 to July 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2022.
Jun 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Arkansas Health Care Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Alabama Nursing Home Association and the Florida Health Care Association.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: DHHS, et al.
Other
Gary D. Marts Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP
200 W. Capitol Ave., Ste. 2300
Little Rock, AR 72201

gmarts@wlj.com
5012121234
Party name: Arkansas Health Care Association
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
2052513000
Party name: Alabama Nursing Home Association and the Florida Health Care Association