No. 21-1454
Title:The Ohio Adjutant General's Department, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Labor Relations Authority, et al.
Docketed:May 17, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3908)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 14, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2022 to July 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2022, for all respondents.
Jun 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Mississippi, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022Brief of Milledge, Matthew Whitmore American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3970, AFL-CIO in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2022Brief of respondent Federal Labor Relations Authority in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Reply of petitioners The Ohio Adjutant General's Department, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Nov 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Federal Labor Relations Authority
Blanket Consent
Nov 09 2022Brief of petitioners The Ohio Adjutant General's Department, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 10 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 9, 2023.
Nov 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3970
Blanket Consent
Nov 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Policy Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Nov 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Mississippi, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Fair Treatment filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of South Carolina filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2022Motion of American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3970 for divided argument submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: The Ohio Adjutant General's Department, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Labor Relations Authority
Matthew Whitmore MilledgeAmerican Federation of Government Employees
80 F Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

matthew.milledge@afge.org
202.639.6424
Party name: American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3970, AFL-CIO
Other
David Richard Dorey
    Counsel of Record
The Fairness Center
500 North Third Street, Suite 600B
Harrisburg, PA 17101

drdorey@fairnesscenter.org
8442931001
Party name: Americans for Fair Treatment
Andres Myles Grajales
    Counsel of Record
AFGE, Office of the General Counsel
80 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

grajaa@afge.org
2026396426
Party name: American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3970
James Emory Smith Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Rembert Dennis Building
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

esmith@scag.gov
803-734-3680
Party name: South Carolina
Craig William Trainor
    Counsel of Record
America First Policy Institute
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 530
Washington, DC 20004

ctrainor@americafirstpolicy.com
202-684-8361
Party name: America First Policy Institute
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: States of Mississippi, et al.