No. 21-1450 | |
Title: | Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., aka Halkbank, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | May 17, 2022 |
Linked with 21A373 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-3499) |
Decision Date: | October 22, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 15, 2021 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 25 2022 | Application (21A373) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2022 to May 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jan 31 2022 | Application (21A373) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 13, 2022. |
May 13 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 07 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2022 to July 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2022. |
Jun 16 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Republic of Azerbaijan and Islamic Republic of Pakistan filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 18 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 02 2022 | Reply of petitioner Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 03 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Oct 03 2022 | Petition GRANTED. |
Nov 10 2022 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 17, 2023. |
Nov 14 2022 | Brief of petitioner Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 14 2022 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 16 2022 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. |
Nov 16 2022 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. The record was received electronically. |
Nov 21 2022 | Brief amici curiae of The Turkish Red Crescent, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 21 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Roger O'Keefe filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Republic of Azerbaijan, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Professors Ingrid (Wuerth) Brunk and William S. Dodge in support of neither party filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Republic of Türkiye filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Lord Daniel Brennan KC filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 07 2022 | CIRCULATED |
Dec 14 2022 | Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 21 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Mark B. Feldman, Esq., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 21 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of United Against Nuclear Iran filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 22 2022 | Record received from the U.S.D.C.-Southern District of New York (1 box of sealed materials). |
Jan 06 2023 | Reply of petitioner Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 17 2023 | Argued. For petitioner: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Lisa Schiavo Blatt Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 680 Maine Avenue SW Washington, DC 20024 lblatt@wc.com | 202-434-5050 |
Party name: Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
William Balden Adams Counsel of Record | Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 51 Madison Avenue 22nd Floor New York, NY 10010 williamadams@quinnemanuel.com | 212-849-7000 |
Party name: Roger O'Keefe | ||
Barrett James Anderson Counsel of Record | Cooley LLP 10265 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 banderson@cooley.com | (858) 550-6000 |
Party name: Professors Ingrid (Wuerth) Brunk and William S. Dodge | ||
Richard Henry Dolan Counsel of Record | Schlam Stone & Dolan, LLP 26 Broadway New York, NY 10004 rdolan@schlamstone.com | 2123445400 |
Party name: Lord Daniel Brennan KC | ||
Jonathan Saul Franklin Counsel of Record | Norton Rose Fulbright US, LLP 799 9th Street NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20001 jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com | 2026620466 |
Party name: Republic of Azerbaijan, Islamic State of Pakistan, and State of Qatar | ||
Jonathan Saul Franklin Counsel of Record | Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 799 9th Street NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20001 jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com | 2026620466 |
Party name: Republic of Azerbaijan and Islamic Republic of Pakistan | ||
Andrew Michael Grossman Counsel of Record | Baker & Hostetler LLP 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. Suite 1100 Washington, DC 20036 agrossman@bakerlaw.com | 2028611697 |
Party name: The Turkish Red Crescent, The Union of Chambers and Commodity Exchanges of Turkiye, and The Banks Association of Turkiye | ||
Gary Martin Osen Counsel of Record | Osen LLC 190 Moore Street Suite 272 Hackensack, NJ 07601 gosen@osenlaw.com | (201) 265-6400 |
Party name: United Against Nuclear Iran | ||
David Samuel Saltzman Counsel of Record | Saltzman & Evinch, PLLC 1310 19th Street NW Washington, DC 20036 dsaltzman@saltzmanevinch.com | 2025502007 |
Party name: Republic of Türkiye | ||
Adam G. Unikowsky Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Avenue, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 AUnikowsky@jenner.com | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Mark B. Feldman, Esq. and Professor Chimène I. Keitner |