No. 21-1448
Title:Dustin Jade Wells, Petitioner
v.
Kathleen A. McCallister
Docketed:May 16, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35984)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 11, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Kathleen A. McCallister to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Central District Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys Association.
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 02 2022Response Requested. (Due September 1, 2022)
Sep 01 2022Brief of respondent Kathleen A. McCallister in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2022Reply of petitioner Dustin Jade Wells filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Oct 11 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave.
Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

arice@jonesday.com
(313) 733-3939
Party name: Dustin Jade Wells
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Ann McCallister
    Counsel of Record
Chapter 13 Trustee, District of Idaho
PO Box 1150
Meridian, ID 83642

kam@kam13trustee.com
208-922-5100
Party name: Kathleen A. McCallister
Other
Matthew David Resnik
    Counsel of Record
RHM LAW, LLP
17609 Ventura Blvd., Suite 314
Encino, CA 91316

matt@rhmfirm.com
8182850100
Party name: Central District Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys Association