No. 21-1431
Title:Robert M. Kerr, Director, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Petitioner
v.
Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al.
Docketed:May 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1043)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2022Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Robert M. Kerr.
Main Document
May 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2022Brief amici curiae of 102 South Carolina Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Family Policy Alliance and State Family Policy Councils filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 12 2022Amicus brief of Americans United for Life not accepted for filing. (May 16, 2022) (duplicate efiling)
May 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Brief amici curiae of 128 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
May 19 2022Letter form counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
May 27 2022Amended motion to expedite consideration of petition for writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2022 to July 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner filed.
Main Document
Jun 06 2022Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari, as amended on May 27, 2022, DENIED.
Jun 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 11, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
616-450-4235
Party name: Robert M. Kerr
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3052
Party name: Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2027414917
Party name: Americans United for Life
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Tim Newton
    Counsel of Record
Murphy & Grantland, P.A.
Post Office Box 6648
Columbia, SC 29260

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
(803) 454-1242
Party name: 102 South Carolina Legislators
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
11921 Freedom Dr.
Suite 550
Reston, VA 20190

anichols@charislex.com
(571) 549-2645
Party name: 128 Members of Congress
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Family Policy Alliance and State Family Policy Councils