No. 21-1428
Title:Donald L. Blankenship, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 9, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6330)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 8, 2022 to July 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 8, 2022.
Jun 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 27 2022Motion of United States for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin L. Hatch
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

bhatch@mcguirewoods.com
2028571700
Party name: Donald L. Blankenship
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Barry J. Pollack
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

bpollack@kramerlevin.com
202-775-4500
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers