No. 21-1418
Title:Medardo Queg Santos, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 4, 2022
Linked with 21A504
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-13973)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2022Application (21A504) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 21, 2022 to May 20, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 15 2022Application (21A504) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 20, 2022.
Apr 08 2022Application (21A504) to extend further the time from April 20, 2022 to May 20, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written Request
Apr 20 2022Application (21A504) denied by Justice Thomas.
Apr 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Arnold Antoine Beller Burns
    Counsel of Record
Burns, P.A.
301 W Platt St. Ste 137
Tampa, FL 33606

tburns@burnslawpa.com
8136426350
Party name: Medardo Queg Santos
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States