No. 21-1405
Title:Lester J. Smith, Petitioner
v.
Timothy C. Ward, Commissioner, Georgia Department of Corrections
Docketed:May 6, 2022
Linked with 21A515
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-13520)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2022Application (21A515) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 29, 2022 to May 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 16 2022Application (21A515) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 28, 2022.
Apr 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2022 to July 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2022.
Jun 03 2022Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society and National Association of Evangelicals filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Law Center for Muslims in America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Sikh Coalition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Prison Officials filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Kristen Bell, J.D., Ph.D., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Religious Freedom Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Prison Safety and Religion Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. Scott Ballenger
    Counsel of Record
Appellate Litigation Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

jscottballenger@gmail.com
202-701-4925
Party name: Lester J. Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen John Petrany
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

spetrany@law.ga.gov
404-458-3408
Party name: Timothy Ward
Other
Arthur Joseph Burke
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardell LLP
450 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10017

arthur.burke@davispolk.com
212-450-4352
Party name: Kristen Bell, J.D., Ph.D., Sharon Dolovich, Brittany Friedman, Ph.D., Nicole B. Godfrey, Danielle C. Jefferis, Judith Resnik, David M. Shapiro, and John Stinneford
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-5600
Party name: Sikh Coalition
Christina A. Jump
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Law Center for Muslims in America
100 North Central Expressway
Suite 1010
Richardson, TX 75080

cjump@clcma.org
9729142507
Party name: Constitutional Law Center for Muslims in America
Kevin Franz King
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

kking@cov.com
202-662-5488
Party name: Former Prison Officials
John Archer Meiser
    Counsel of Record
Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Clinic
1305 Biolchini Hall of Law
Notre Dame, IN 46556

jmeiser@nd.edu
574-631-3880
Party name: Religious Freedom Institute
John Savage Moran
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jmoran@mcguirewoods.com
(202) 828-2817
Party name: Prison Safety and Religion Scholars
Krystal Brunner Swendsboe
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

Kswendsboe@wiley.law
202-719-7000
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, Agudath Israel of America, and the Aleph Institute
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Christian Legal Society and National Association of Evangelicals