No. 21-1402
Title:Outdoor One Communications LLC, Petitioner
v.
Charter Township of Canton, Michigan
Docketed:May 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1323)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 28, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald Richard Sheff II
    Counsel of Record
Office of Gen. Counsel, Outdoor One Commc'ns LLC
39555 Orchard Hill Place
Suite 600
Novi, MI 48375

dsheff@outdooronellc.com
248-289-5895
Party name: Outdoor One Communications LLC