No. 21-1399
Title:Ali Al-Maqablh, Petitioner
v.
Crystal L. Heinz, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2022
Linked with 21A567
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5548)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 24 2022Application (21A567) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2022 to June 3, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Apr 04 2022Application (21A567) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until June 3, 2022.
Apr 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Jun 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to July 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 29, 2022, for all respondents.
Jul 28 2022Brief of respondent Trooper James Phelps and Lindsey Jo Alley in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 16 2022Reply of petitioner Ali Al-Maqablh filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Thompson v. Clark, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marisa Christina Maleck
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

mmaleck@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Ali Al-Maqablh
Attorneys for Respondents
Nathan Andrew Lennon
    Counsel of Record
Reminger
250 Grandview Dr., Suite 550
Ft. Mitchell, KY 41017

nlennon@reminger.com
513-252-6660
Party name: Trooper James Phelps