No. 21-1398
Title:Nelson Daniel Centeno, Petitioner
v.
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Docketed:May 2, 2022
Linked with 21A485
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Puerto Rico
   Case Numbers:(AC-2021-0086)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 10, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2022Application (21A485) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 10, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 10 2022Application (21A485) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until May 2, 2022.
Apr 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rachel Brill
    Counsel of Record
263 Domenech Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918

rabrill@gmail.com
787-753-6131
Party name: Nelson Daniel Centeno