No. 21-1397
Title:In Re Grand Jury
Docketed:May 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55085, 21-55145)
   Decision Date:January 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2022Motion (21M105) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Apr 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022MOTION (21M105) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Motion (21M105) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.
May 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2022.
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of California Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 1, 2022.
Aug 01 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 12 2022Reply of petitioner In Re Grand Jury filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: In Re Grand Jury
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Adria S. Price
    Counsel of Record
Price & Assoc., LLC
43 North Kringle Place
Post Office Box 100
Santa Claus, IN 47579

adria@pricelaw.net
812-937-4444
Party name: California Lawyers Association