No. 21-1394
Title:John Fitisemanu, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:April 29, 2022
Linked with 21A494
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4017, 20-4019)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 27, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2022Application (21A494) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 27, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 10 2022Application (21A494) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until April 27, 2022.
Apr 11 2022Application (21A494) to extend further the time from April 27, 2022 to May 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Application (21A494) denied by Justice Gorsuch.
Apr 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2022 to June 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 30, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: John Fitisemanu, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America, et al.