No. 21-1384
Title:Florida, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 26, 2022
Linked with 21A475
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13595)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 22, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2022Application (21A475) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 22, 2022 to April 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Application (21A475) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 21, 2022.
Apr 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 26, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2022 to June 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. (Corrected Service List received 5/16/22)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 27, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: Florida Office of the Attorney General State of Florida
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America, Department of Justice