No. 21-1382
Title:Audubon Imports, LLC, dba Mercedes Benz of Baton Rouge, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft (BMW AG), et al.
Docketed:April 26, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17139)
   Decision Date:October 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 26, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher James Cormier
    Counsel of Record
Burns Charest LLP
4725 Wisconsin Ave, NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20016

ccormier@burnscharest.com
202-557-3977
Party name: Audubon Imports LLC d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Baton Rouge, et al.