No. 21-138
Title:Luz González-Bermúdez, Petitioner
v.
Abbott Laboratories P.R. Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2249)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2021Brief of respondents Abbott Laboratories P.R. Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 15 2021Reply of petitioner Luz González-Bermúdez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Terence Kirkpatrick
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Luz González-Bermúdez
Attorneys for Respondents
Virginia Anne Seitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Abbott Laboratories P.R. Inc., et al.