No. 21-1373
Title:D. D., A Minor, By and Through His Guardian ad Litem, Michaela Ingram, Petitioner,
v.
Los Angeles Unified School District
Docketed:April 22, 2022
Linked with 21A404
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55810)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2022Application (21A404) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 17, 2022 to April 18, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 09 2022Application (21A404) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 18, 2022.
Apr 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2022Brief of respondent Los Angeles Unified School District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 21 2022Rescheduled.
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patricia Ann Van Dyke
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Patricia A. Van Dyke
1120 Forest Avenue, #292
Pacific Grove, CA 93950

patsy@lawofficeofpvandyke.com
(818) 517-5371
Party name: D.D., a Minor, by and through His Guardian Ad Litem, Michaela Ingram
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Raymond Hicks
    Counsel of Record
BDG Law Group
10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1015
Los Angeles, CA 90024

mhicks@bdgfirm.com
(310) 470-6110
Party name: Los Angeles Unified School District