No. 21-1370
Title:Spireon, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Procon Analytics, LLC
Docketed:April 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1954)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2022Brief of Procon Analytics, LLC in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Bergstrand Jinkins
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Coburn LLP
One U.S. Bank Plaza
St. Louis, MO 63101

djinkins@thompsoncoburn.com
(314) 552-6000
Party name: Spireon, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Edward Dodson Lanquist Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Intellectual Property Law, P.C.
1600 Division Street, Suite 500
Nashville, TN 37203

edl@iplawgroup.com
6152422400
Party name: Procon Analytics, LLC