No. 21-1368
Title:Old Dominion Electric Cooperative, Petitioner
v.
PJM Interconnection, LLC
Docketed:April 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1483)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Waiver of right of respondent PJM Interconnection, LLC to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 20 2022Response Requested. (Due June 21, 2022)
Jun 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2022 to July 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 21, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: PJM Interconnection, LLC