No. 21-1364 | |
Title: | Mordechai Korf, et al., Petitioners v. United States |
Docketed: | April 20, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-14223-AA) |
Decision Date: | August 30, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 19, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 18 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2022 to June 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 16 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2022. See Rule 30.1. |
May 20 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Retired Federal Judges filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 20 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Criminal Law and Legal Ethics filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2022 to July 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 15 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 21, 2022. |
Jul 21 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 08 2022 | Reply of petitioners Mordechai Korf, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Michael R. Dreeben Counsel of Record | O’Melveny & Myers LLP 1625 Eye Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 mdreeben@omm.com | 202-383-5300 |
Party name: Mordechai Korf, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America | ||
Other | ||
Celeste Lidwina Maria Koeleveld Counsel of Record | Clifford Chance US LLP 31 West 52nd Street New York, NY 10019 celeste.koeleveld@cliffordchance.com | 212 878-8000 |
Party name: Retired Federal Judges | ||
Jonathan Ian Kravis Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 601 Massachusetts Ave. NW, Suite 500E Washington, DC 20001 Jonathan.Kravis@mto.com | 202-220-1130 |
Party name: Professors of Criminal Law and Legal Ethics |