No. 21-1360
Title:Mike Kowall, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Secretary of State
Docketed:April 19, 2022
Linked with 21A382
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1129)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2022Application (21A382) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2022 to April 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022Application (21A382) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 16, 2022.
Apr 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2022Waiver of right of respondent Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Secretary of State to respond filed.
Main Document
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
May 31 2022Response Requested. (Due June 30, 2022)
Jun 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 30, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Mike Kowall, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Jocelyn Benson, Mi Secretary of State