No. 21-1359 | |
Title: | Robert Corliss, Petitioner v. Crossroads Financing, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | April 19, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Sixth Appellate District |
Case Numbers: | (H049211) |
Decision Date: | November 12, 2021 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | January 5, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 05 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 17 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Crossroads Financing, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 24 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022. |
May 27 2022 | Supplemental Brief of Robert Corliss not accepted for filing. (June 06, 2022) (Duplicate efiling) |
Jun 01 2022 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Robert Corliss filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 13 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Samuel Kornhauser Counsel of Record | Suite 1807 155 Jackson Street Suite 1807 San Francisco, CA 94111 samuel.kornhauser@gmail.com | 4159816281 |
Party name: Robert Corliss | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Gerald M. Serlin Counsel of Record | BENEDON & SERLIN, LLP 22708 Mariano Street Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6128 gerald@benedonserlin.com | (818) 340-1950 |
Party name: Crossroads Financing, LLC |