No. 21-1357 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James S. Tyler, III, Petitioner
v.
Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Docketed:April 18, 2022
Linked with 21A391
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2020-KP-00984)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2022Application (21A391) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2022 to April 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 03 2022Application (21A391) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 16, 2022.
Mar 29 2022Application of James Tyler for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (March 31, 2022)
Apr 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2022 to June 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2022.
May 18 2022Amicus brief of Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers not accepted for filing.(Corrected version to be submitted) (May 20, 2022)
May 20 2022Amicus brief of Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Sothern
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of William M. Sothern
1024 Elysian Fields Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70117

billy@sothernlaw.com
(504) 524-7922
Party name: James S. Tyler, III
Attorneys for Respondent
James Edward Stewart Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney, Caddo Parish
501 Texas St.
Shreveport, LA 71101-5400

jstewart@caddoda.com
3182266955
Party name: Warden Darrel Vannoy Louisiana State Penitentiary
Other
Edward K. Alexander Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Calcasieu Public Defenders Office
P.O. Box 3757
1011 Lakeshore Drive, Suite 200
Lake Charles, LA 70602-3757

ekalexander@pdolaw.org
3374361718
Party name: Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers