No. 21-1354 | |
Title: | Bast Amron LLP, Petitioner v. United States Trustee Region 21 |
Docketed: | April 18, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-12547) |
Decision Date: | January 14, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2022) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 18 2022 | Memorandum of respondent United States Trustee Region 21 filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022. |
Jun 27 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Siegel v. Fitzgerald, 596 U. S. ___ (2022). |
Jul 29 2022 | JUDGMENT ISSUED |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jeffrey P. Bast Counsel of Record | Bast Amron LLP One Southeast Third Avenue Suite 1400 Miami, FL 33131 jbast@bastamron.com | 3053797904 |
Party name: Bast Amron LLP | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States Trustee Region 21 |