No. 21-1352
Title:Vivian Tat, aka Vivian Lnu, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 14, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50034)
   Decision Date:October 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 12, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael V. Schafler
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Williams LLP
724 South Spring Street
Ninth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90014

mschafler@cohen-williams.com
2132325144
Party name: Vivian Tat
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States