No. 21-1347
Title:Kevas L. Ballance, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 13, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3141)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Tyler Hansmeier
    Counsel of Record
Kansas Federal Public Defender
500 State Avenue
Suite 201
Kansas City, KS 66101

daniel_hansmeier@fd.org
913-551-6712
Party name: Kevas Ballance
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States