No. 21-1340
Title:Lynn D. Becker, Petitioner
v.
Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation, et al.
Docketed:April 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4030, 18-4072)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:January 12, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 11, 2022 to June 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Savage Moran
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jmoran@mcguirewoods.com
(202) 828-2817
Party name: Lynn D. Becker
Attorneys for Respondents
Frances Clare Bassett
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Earnhart Real Bird & Wilson LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

fbassett@nativelawgroup.com
303-926-5292
Party name: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation, et al.