No. 21-1338
Title:NSO Group Technologies Limited, et al., Petitioners
v.
WhatsApp Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16408)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 6, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2022Brief of respondents WhatsApp LLC and Meta Platforms, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Reply of petitioners NSO Group Technologies Limited, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 02 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners NSO Group Technologies Limited, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 07 2022Supplemental brief of respondent WhatsApp LLC and Meta Platforms, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: NSO Group Technologies Limited, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: WhatsApp LLC and Meta Platforms, Inc.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States