No. 21-1333
Title:Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al., Petitioners
v.
Google LLC
Docketed:April 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16700)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2022 to July 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2022.
Jul 05 2022Brief of respondent Google LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2022Reply of petitioners Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-660-8845
Party name: Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Google LLC
Brian Michael WillenWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 497-7700
Party name: Google LLC