No. 21-133
Title:Jorge Alejandro Rojas, Petitioner
v.
Federal Aviation Administration
Docketed:August 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55036)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 2, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2021 to October 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 1, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Naomi Jean Scotten
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

nscotten@orrick.com
(212) 506-5116
Party name: Jorge Alejandro Rojas
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Aviation Administration
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Cecere PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Cato Institute