No. 21-1329
Title:Estate of Geraldine F. Jennings, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gulfshore Private Home Care, LLC
Docketed:April 5, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-14415)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 14, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2022Waiver of right of respondent Gulfshore Private Home Care, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Eric Nelson, Esq
54 Florence Street
Staten Island, NY 10308

ericnelson@ericnelsonesq.com
(718) 356-0566
Party name: Estate of Geraldine F. Jennings, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Anna Dorkas Torres
    Counsel of Record
TorresVictor
321 S. Dixie Hwy, Suite 201
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

atorres@torresvictor.com
5615680516
Party name: Gulfshore Private Home Care, LLC