No. 21-1327 | |
Title: | Apple Inc., Petitioner v. Qualcomm Incorporated |
Docketed: | April 5, 2022 |
Linked with 21A377 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-1683, 2020-1763, 2020-1764, 2020-1827) |
Decision Date: | November 10, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 27 2022 | Application (21A377) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 8, 2022 to April 8, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main Document | |
Feb 01 2022 | Application (21A377) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 8, 2022. |
Apr 01 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 02 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Qualcomm Incorporated to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 03 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022. |
May 10 2022 | Response Requested. (Due June 9, 2022) |
May 16 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 9, 2022 to June 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 30, 2022. |
Jun 30 2022 | Brief of respondent Qualcomm Incorporated in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 20 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Mark Christopher Fleming Counsel of Record | WilmerHale 60 State Street Boston, MA 02109 mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com | 6175266000 |
Party name: Apple Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jonathan Saul Franklin Counsel of Record | Norton Rose Fulbright US, LLP 799 9th Street NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20001 jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com | 2026620466 |
Party name: Qualcomm Incorporated |