No. 21-1326
Title:United States ex rel. Tracy Schutte, et al., Petitioners
v.
SuperValu Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 5, 2022
Linked with 21A439
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2241)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 3, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2022Application (21A439) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 3, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2022Application (21A439) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until April 1, 2022.
Apr 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Waiver of right of respondent SuperValu, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 19 2022Response Requested. (Due May 19, 2022)
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 19, 2022 to June 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
May 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Senator Charles E. Grassley filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2022Brief of respondents SuperValu, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Jul 06 2022Reply of petitioners United States ex rel. Tracy Schutte, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
2026293530
Party name: United States ex rel. Tracy Schutte, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-389-5191
Party name: SuperValu, Inc., et al.
Other
Eric Ross Havian
    Counsel of Record
Constantine Cannon LLP
150 California Street, Suite 1600
San Francisco, CA 94111

ehavian@constantinecannon.com
415-342-4585
Party name: Senator Charles E. Grassley
Jennifer Marie Verkamp
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Verkamp LLC
35 East Seventh Street
Suite 600
Cincinnati, OH 45202

jverkamp@morganverkamp.com
5136514400
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund