No. 21-1322
Title:Jan M. Sensenich, Petitioner
v.
PHH Mortgage Corporation
Docketed:April 4, 2022
Linked with 21A349
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1, 20-2, 20-3)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2022Application (21A349) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2022 to March 17, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 22 2022Application (21A349) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 17, 2022.
Mar 05 2022Application (21A349) to extend further the time from March 17, 2022 to March 31, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 10 2022Application (21A349) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 31, 2022.
Mar 31 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Hon. Melanie Cyganowski (Ret.), et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Chapter 13 Trustees.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2022Brief of respondent PHH Mortgage Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Jan M. Sensenich, Chapter 13 Trustee
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew J. Delude
    Counsel of Record
Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer PC
900 Elm Street, 19th Floor
PO Box 3600
Manchester, NH 03105-3600

mdelude@primmer.com
6036263324
Party name: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Other
Henry Edward Hildebrand III
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 340019
Nashville, TN 37203

hank@ch13bna.com
615-244-1101
Party name: National Association of Chapter 13 Trustees
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
David Kuney Law
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
(301) 299-4336
Party name: Hon. Melanie Cyganowski (Ret.), Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Ret.), Hon. Bruce Markell (Ret.), Hon. Eugene Wedoff (Ret.) and Law Professors George Kuney, Nancy Rapoport and Jack Williams