No. 21-1319
Title:Mark Nordlicht and David Levy, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:April 4, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3207, 19-3209)
   Decision Date:November 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2022 to June 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2022.
May 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jennifer L. Mascott filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

steven.engel@dechert.com
2022613300
Party name: Mark Nordlicht, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jennifer Lee Mascott
    Counsel of Record
Scalia Law School
3301 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22201

jmascott@gmu.edu
703-993-8168
Party name: Professor Jennifer L. Mascott