No. 21-1313
Title:Martin Gottesfeld, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 1, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1669, 19-1042, 19-1043, 19-1107)
   Decision Date:November 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 30, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2022 to June 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2022.
May 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 1, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

daniel.geyser@haynesboone.com
303-382-6219
Party name: Martin Gottesfeld
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America