No. 21-1307
Title:Santa Ana Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rubyann Mondragon
Docketed:March 30, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B307872)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 15, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2022Waiver of right of respondent Rubyann Mondragon to respond filed.
Main Document
May 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 04 2022Response Requested. (Due June 3, 2022)
May 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2022 to July 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Zarmi
    Counsel of Record
Zarmi Law
8950 W Olympic Blvd., #533
Beverly Hills, CA 90211

davidzarmi@gmail.com
3108416455
Party name: Santa Ana Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael D. Singer
    Counsel of Record
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
605 C Street, Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92101

msinger@ckslaw.com
619-595-3001
Party name: Rubyann Mondragon