No. 21-13
Title:KinderCare Education, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A159824)
   Decision Date:January 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 28, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2021Brief of respondent Rochelle Westmoreland in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Roy Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton
1901 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

tkaufman@sheppardmullin.com
3102283748
Party name: KinderCare Education, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Larry Wei Lee
    Counsel of Record
Diversity Law Group, P.C.
515 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1250
Los Angeles, CA 90071

lwlee@diversitylaw.com
213-488-6555
Party name: Rochelle Westmoreland