No. 21-1297
Title:Clare Therese Grady, Carmen Trotta, and Martha Hennessy, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:March 25, 2022
Linked with 21A421
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-14341)
   Decision Date:November 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2022Application (21A421) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 20, 2022 to March 24, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 16 2022Application (21A421) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 23, 2022.
Mar 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2022 to May 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 25, 2022.
May 23 2022Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Matthias Cosgrove
    Counsel of Record
Law Office
114 N. Franklin Street
Wilkes Barre, PA 18701

jmcosgro@msn.com
570-823-9078
Party name: Clare Therese Grady, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America