No. 21-1296
Title:City of Edmond, Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
BNSF Railway Company
Docketed:March 25, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-6000, 21-6005)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2022 to May 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 25, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: BNSF Railway Company