No. 21-1295
Title:St. Augustine School, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jill Underly, in Her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al.
Docketed:March 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2333)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 19, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 27, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2022Brief of respondents Jill Underly, in her official capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 27 2022Brief of respondent Friess Lake School District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2022Reply of petitioners St. Augustine School, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn Ave.
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: St. Augustine School, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Hannah Schieber Jurss
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 West Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53703-7857

jursshs@doj.state.wi.us
608-266-8101
Party name: Jill Underly, in her official capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al.
Danielle Baudhuin Tierney
    Counsel of Record
Axley Brynelson, LLP
2 E. Mifflin Street, Suite 200
Madison, WI 53703

dtierney@axley.com
608283-6712
Party name: Friess Lake School District