No. 21-1292
Title:S. Baxter Jones, Petitioner
v.
City of Detroit, Michigan
Docketed:March 24, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1055)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2022Waiver of right of respondent City of Detroit, Michigan to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 02 2022Response Requested. (Due June 1, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gerard V. Mantese
    Counsel of Record
Mantese Honigman, PC
1361 East Big Beaver Road
Troy, MI 48083

gmantese@manteselaw.com
248-457-9200
Party name: S. Baxter Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Cheryl L. RonkCity of Detroit Law Department
2 Woodward, Suite 500
Detroit, MI 48226

ronk@detroitmi.gov
248-378-5850
Party name: City of Detroit, Michigan