No. 21-1283
Title:Animal Science Products, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al.
Docketed:March 23, 2022
Linked with 21A227
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-4791)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2021Application (21A227) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 19, 2022 to March 20, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Application (21A227) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 21, 2022.
Mar 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors William S. Dodge and Paul B. Stephan filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2022 to June 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2022.
Apr 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Julian Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
1875 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

MGottlieb@willkie.com
2023031442
Party name: Animal Science Products Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan M. Jacobson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati PC
1301 Avenue of the Americas
40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

jjacobson@wsgr.com
212-999-5800
Party name: Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al.
Other
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Professors William S. Dodge and Paul B. Stephan
Michael Francis Murray
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

michaelmurray@paulhastings.com
(202) 551-1700
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America