No. 21-1281
Title:Interactive Wearables, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Polar Electro Oy, et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1491)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Waiver of right of respondent Polar Electro Oy, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
Apr 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Chicago Patent Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2022Response Requested. (Due May 27, 2022)
May 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 27, 2022 to June 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 27, 2022.
Jun 27 2022Brief of respondents Polar Electro Oy, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2022Reply of petitioner Interactive Wearables, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrea Pacelli
    Counsel of Record
King & Wood Mallesons LLP
500 Fifth Avenue, 50th Floor
New York, NY 10110

andrea.pacelli@us.kwm.com
212-319-4755
Party name: Interactive Wearables, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Anthony James Fuga
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
150 N. Riverside Plaza
27th Floor
Chicago, IL 60606

anthony.fuga@hklaw.com
312.715.5771
Party name: Polar Electro Oy, et al.
Other
Kevin Edward Noonan
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP
300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60606

noonan@mbhb.com
312-913-0001
Party name: The Chicago Patent Attorneys