No. 21-1271
Title:Timothy K. Moore, in His Official Capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rebecca Harper, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2022
Linked with 21A455
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(413PA21)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2022Application (21A455) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Response to application (21A455) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 5 p.m. on Wednesday, March 2, 2022.
Feb 25 2022Letter dated February 25, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Mar 02 2022Response to application from State Respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondents Rebecca Harper, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondent Common Cause filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondents North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Republican National Committee, NRCC, North Carolina Republican Party.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Reply of applicants Timothy Moore, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Application (21A455) referred to the Court.
Mar 07 2022Application (21A455) denied by the Court. Justice Kavanaugh concurring in the denial of the application for stay. (Detached opinion). Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of the application for stay. (Detached opinion).
Mar 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to June 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2022.
Apr 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondents North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2022Brief of respondents State Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondent Common Cause in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondents Rebecca Harper, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Reply of petitioners Timothy Moore, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 19 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 19, 2022.
Jul 25 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Common Cause
Blanket Consent
Jul 26 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State Respondents
Blanket Consent
Aug 04 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 09 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Rebecca Harper, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 29 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Timothy Moore, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief of petitioners Timothy Moore, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Amicus brief of White House Watch, a project of United States Public Policy Council et al. (including 33 Individuals) not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (September 02, 2022)
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Senator Kim Ward, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin Voter Alliance, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Hon. John R. Ashcroft filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers For Honest Elections filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Legislative Exchange Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of APA Watch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Republican National Committee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Conference of Chief Justices in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Group of New York Voters in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Lawyers Democracy Fund and State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of America's Future, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of White House Watch, a project of United States Public Policy Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Timothy Moore, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 03 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Timothy Moore, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Gardner Boyce
    Counsel of Record
NC Department of Justice
Post Office Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

sboyce@ncdoj.gov
7046747708
Party name: State Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Common Cause
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Rebecca Harper, et al.
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc.
Other
John Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington St.
Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204

adams@publicinterestlegal.org
317-203-5599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: States of Arkansas, Arizona, Alabama, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas, and Utah.
David William Telford Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Carroll, Ucker & Hemmer LLC
PO Box 12045
Columbus, OH 43212

dcarroll@cuhlaw.com
614-423-9820
Party name: White House Watch, a project of United States Public Policy Council et al. (including 33 Individuals)
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave, #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

jeastman@ccg1776.com
909-257-3869
Party name: The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Lee Elton Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

lgoodman@wiley.law
(202) 719-7000
Party name: The American Legislative Exchange Council
Phillip Michael Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

pgordon@holtzmanvogel.com
540-341-8808
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections, Inc.
Anthony R. Holtzman
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
Harrisburg, PA 17101

anthony.holtzman@klgates.com
717-231-4570
Party name: Senator Kim Ward, the Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania Senate, and the Republican Caucus of the Pennsylvania Senate
Brett William Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.
400 E. Van Buren
Phoenix, AZ 85004

bwjohnson@swlaw.com
602-382-6312
Party name: Independent Redistricting Commission
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: APA Watch
Erick G. Kaardal
    Counsel of Record
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson P.A.
150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3100
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kaardal@mklaw.com
612-465-0927
Party name: Wisconsin Voter Alliance and Pure Integrity Michigan Elections
Gary Michael Lawkowski
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group
2121 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 402
Alexandria, VA 22314

GLawkowski@dhillonlaw.com
7039650330
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and the Presidential Coalition
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Honest Elections Project
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Inc.
Jesus Armando Osete
    Counsel of Record
Secretary of State of Missouri
600 W. Main St.
Jefferson City, MO 65101

Jesus.Osete@sos.mo.gov
(573) 751-4875
Party name: Hon. John R. Ashcroft
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Conference of Chief Justices
David B. Rivkin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

drivkin@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1731
Party name: Lawyers Democracy Fund and State Legislators
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: Republican National Committee, NRCC, North Carolina Republican Party
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: Group of New York Voters
David Stevenson Walker II
    Counsel of Record
WALKER KIGER, PLLC
100 Professional Ct, Suite 102
Garner, NC 27529

steven@walkerkiger.com
984-200-1930
Party name: TAXPAYERS FOR HONEST ELECTIONS